skip to content

Richardson, John Weir

CPSO#: 23957

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Nov 2016