skip to content

Richardson, Christopher Wayne

CPSO#: 88630

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Oct 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cottage Country Family Health Team
1-5 Pineridge Gate
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1Z3
Phone: (705) 687-2794
Fax: (705) 687-8652 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: (705) 645-4400
Fax: (705) 645-4594
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher Richardson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Richardson ( CPSO# 88630 )

Business Address:
Cottage Country Family Health Team
Suite 1
5 Pineridge Gate
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1Z3
Phone Number: (705) 687-2271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WAYNE RICHARDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 18 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2010