skip to content

Richards-Bentley, Christopher Matthew

CPSO#: 95411

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health and Wellness Centre
Koffler Student Services Centre
University of Toronto
214 College Street, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: (416) 978-8030
Fax: (416) 978-7341 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Springboard Clinic
Suite 301
1055 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4W2L2
Canada
Phone: (416) 901-3077
Fax: (416) 901-3079
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1001 Queen St W
Emergency Department
Centre for Addiction and Mental Hea
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: 416-535-8501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

183 Glenrose Ave
Toronto ON  M4T 1K7
Canada
Phone: 416-754-8358
Fax: 416-490-8562
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MATTHEW RICHARDS-BENTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDS-BENTLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016