skip to content

Richards, Richard Lloyd

CPSO#: 21952

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
21 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University Of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R. L. Richards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 8 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: DOCUdavit Solutions 28 Eugene St North York ON M6B 3Z4 1-888-781-9083 Fax:1-866-297-9338 [email protected]
Date Received: 18 Jun 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2021