skip to content

Richards, Larry Marshall

CPSO#: 20919

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Sep 1996

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Western University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 02 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Sep 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 1997