skip to content

Richards, Frank

CPSO#: 21715

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Mar 1989

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 22-Feb-2004

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1989
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2000

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Mar 1989
Summary:

 In March 1989, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Richards guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Richards be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee also 
 ruled that there be a permanent restriction on the Doctor's licence, to the effect that he be 
 prohibited from practicing anaesthesia.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 06 Mar 1989