skip to content

Richards, Enoka Geraldine

CPSO#: 96927

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Swaminathan, Enoka Geraldine (used until: 01 Oct 2020 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Avalon University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Rossland Rd East, Suite 105
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: 905-239-7663
Fax: 905-239-4664 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Enoka Richards Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Richards ( CPSO# 96927 )

Business Address:
300 Rossland Road East
Suite 105
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone Number: (905) 239-7663

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ENOKA GERALDINE RICHARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014