skip to content

Nahas, Richard

CPSO#: 72330

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
942 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z9
Phone: (613) 727-7246
Fax: (613) 727-7247 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Nahas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nahas ( CPSO# 72330 )

Business Address:
942 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z9
Phone Number: (613) 727-7246

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD NAHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAHAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 17 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2020

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Naha’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Nahas sexually abused Patient A and engaged disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct towards Patient A during a medical appointment in approximately November 2016, including by touching her body, including her genital area, in a manner that was sexual and/or inappropriate, by breaching boundaries, and by making inappropriate remarks and remarks of a sexual nature towards Patient A.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion: July 4, 2019 Motion: May 26, 2020 Hearing: July 27 to 30, 2020

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 14, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

NOTE: An application has been made for judicial review of this decision by the Divisional Court, Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)