skip to content

Richard, Katayoun

CPSO#: 85274

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
2200 Eglinton West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 3978
Fax: (905) 813-3042 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K. Richard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Richard ( CPSO# 85274 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:09 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Radiology Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATAYOUN RICHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 10 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013