skip to content

Henry, Richard Anthony

CPSO#: 63132

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Sep 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Aug 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Anaesthesia & Periope
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: (613) 548-1375 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Henry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 24 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 May 2019

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Henry, Richard Anthony (July 11, 2018) Allegations of Dr. Henry’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee. It is alleged that Dr. Henry engaged in sexual abuse of Patient A and/or in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct with Patient A, including sexual and/or inappropriate touching of Patient A’s buttocks and by making sexual and/or inappropriate comments to Patient A.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): July 22, 2019 half day hearing 9:00 a.m. start time

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 07 May 2019 Active
             (1 of 2)

            As from May 7, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Richard Anthony
            Henry, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Henry to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                   DR. RICHARD ANTHONY HENRY  
                                          ("Dr. Henry")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Henry, certificate of registration number 63132, am a member of
                  the College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7216111 (the "Investigation") into concerns about my
                  standard of practice and conduct in my chronic pain management practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by the ICR Committee, the College will also
                  deliver a caution in person.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        1.    The University of Toronto Safer Opioid Prescribing course;
                              and
                  
                        2.    A self-directed review of the following materials:
                  
                              (i)   College Policy Statement #7-16: Prescribing Drugs; and
                  
                              (ii)  The 2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to complete these requirements within three
                        (3) months.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (6)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a chart review of
                        a minimum of fifteen (15) patient charts, and may also include
                        direct observation of my care, an interview with me, interviews
                        with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any
                        other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Henry, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.

                  (d)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted Dr. Henry's standard of
                              practice and conduct in his chronic pain management practice.
                              As a result of the investigation: 
                  
                                    Dr. Henry will engage in professional education in
                                    opioid prescribing.
                  
                                    Dr. Henry's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within six (6) months of the
                                    completion of the professional education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Henry, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  Chiefs of Staffs and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Henry, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Henry, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff
                  and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the
                  following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
            (2 of 2)

            As from 12:01 a.m., August 24, 2018, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Richard Anthony Henry:

            Practice Monitor and Patient Log

            (i)   Dr. Henry shall not engage in any professional encounters, in person or
                  otherwise (the "Professional Encounter") with patients of any age in any
                  jurisdiction, with the exceptions of care provided in the Operating and
                  Recovering Room, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the
                  continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a monitor
                  who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the
                  "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in the
                  Order are fulfilled. For further clarity, with the exceptions of care
                  provided in the Operating and Recovering Room, Dr. Henry must not be
                  alone with any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional
                  Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also
                  present; 

            (ii)  At all times, Dr. Henry shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:

                  (a)   Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                        undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                  (b)   Remain present at all times during all Professional Encounters with
                        all patients;
                  
                  (c)   Carefully observe all of Dr. Henry's Professional Encounters with
                        patients including, but not limited to, physical and internal
                        examinations.  It is Dr. Henry's obligation to ensure that the
                        Practice Monitor's view of all of his Professional Encounters with
                        patients, including physical and internal examinations, is
                        unobstructed at all times;  
                  
                  (d)   Refrain from performing other functions, except those required in
                        the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "B" to the
                        Order, while observing Dr. Henry in all his Professional Encounters
                        with patients;
                  
                  (e)   Maintain a log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the
                        form attached as Appendix "C" to the Order (the "Log");
                  
                  (f)   Initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted
                        in the Log; and
                  
                  (g)   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis.
                  
            (iii) Dr. Henry shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request;

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (iv)  Dr. Henry shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practises or has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within five (5) days of the Order.  Going forward, he
                  shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                  five (5) days of commencing practice at that location;

            Posting a Sign and Translations

            (v)   Dr. Henry shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                  consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, with the exceptions
                  of the Operating and Recovering Room, in a clearly visible and secure
                  location, in the form attached hereto as Appendix "D" to the Order that
                  states: "Dr. Richard Anthony Henry must not have professional encounters,
                  in person or otherwise, with patients, of any age, with the exceptions of
                  care provided in the Operating and Recovering Room, unless in the
                  continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a practice
                  monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
                  Dr. Henry must not be alone during any professional encounter with any
                  patient with the exceptions of care provided in the Operating and
                  Recovering Room. Further information may be found on the College website
                  at www.cpso.on.ca."; 

            (vi)  Dr. Henry shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the sign described in section (v) above,
                  in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of
                  his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the
                  form attached hereto as Appendix "D" to the Order;

            (vii) Dr. Henry shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (vi)
                  above to the College within thirty (30) days of the date of the Order;

            Notifying Patients

            (viii)Dr. Henry shall ensure that each patient with whom he has a Professional
                  Encounter, with the exceptions of patients treated in the Operating and
                  Recovering Room, is directly notified, prior to the Professional
                  Encounter, of the details of the restriction described in section (i),
                  above; 

            (ix)  With respect to patients that are scheduled at least seven (7) days in
                  advance, Dr. Henry shall ensure that each patient is directly notified,
                  within seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details
                  of the restriction described in section (i) above;

            Monitoring

            (x)   Dr. Henry shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr.
                  Henry's compliance with the terms of the Order and shall promptly sign
                  such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;

            (xi)  Dr. Henry shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor Dr. Henry's compliance with the terms of
                  the Order;

            (xii) Dr. Henry shall consent to the College providing any and all information
                  to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or desirable in
                  order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling their Undertaking and
                  in order to monitor Dr. Henry's compliance with the terms of the Order;

            (xiii)Dr. Henry shall consent to all Practice Monitors disclosing to the
                  College, and to one another, any information relevant to the Order,
                  relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's Undertaking and/or
                  relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Henry's compliance with the
                  Order; and

            (xiv) Dr. Henry shall consent to the College providing the Order to any
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location where he practises or has privileges, and to provide
                  said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring of his
                  compliance with the Order.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: May 7, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Richard Anthony Henry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 7, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted Dr. Henry’s standard of practice and conduct in his chronic pain management practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Henry will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing.

Dr. Henry’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the completion of the professional education.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 7, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 11, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)