skip to content

Rice, Brenda Lynn

CPSO#: 96729

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5063
Fax: (705) 876-8181 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Brenda Rice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rice ( CPSO# 96729 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5063

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Critical Care Medicine Effective:09 Mar 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Respirology Effective:01 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 May 2013 Active
             Dr. Brenda Lynn Rice may practice medicine independently in respirology and
            critical care medicine, only.