skip to content

Ribeiro, Igo Barbosa

CPSO#: 94802

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education: Universidade Federal Do Ceara, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 4, 2022
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On July 4, 2022,  Kingston Health Sciences Centre (the “Hospital”) notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Ribeiro resigned from the Hospital as a result of an investigation into Dr. Ribeiro’s practice.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 25 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 17 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2022