skip to content

Reza, Erona

CPSO#: 93716

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Dhaka, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WVU Medicine
Department of Family Medicine
6040 University Town Centre Drive
Morgantown WV  26501
United States
Phone: 304-598-6900
Fax: 304-285-7372

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Arkansas
USA - West Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERONA REZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 27 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 16 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2013 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2013