skip to content

Reynolds, Robert Bruce

CPSO#: 28840

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
176 Center Street
Deseronto ON  K0K 1X0
Phone: (613) 396-3420
Fax: (613) 396-5105 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT BRUCE REYNOLDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYNOLDS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 May 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 May 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2020

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 18, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 13, 2019, Dr. Reynolds has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)