skip to content

Reynolds, Luke Foster

CPSO#: 98992

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 4373497044 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUKE FOSTER REYNOLDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYNOLDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017