skip to content

Reynolds, Kenneth John

CPSO#: 24869

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Reynolds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS, 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6, (416) 398-0638 or 1(888) 563-3732
Date Received: 06 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: September 1, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Kenneth John Reynolds to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 1, 2015:

Dr. Reynolds has ceased to practise medicine due to disability and therefore cannot see patients or provide any medical advice or services.