skip to content

Reynolds, Katelyn Bret

CPSO#: 98472

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Ave
Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416-978-6976 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAMH (College Street Site)
Department of Psychiatry
250 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416-535-8501
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Reynolds & Toupin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Reynolds ( CPSO# 98472 )
Dr. P. Toupin ( CPSO# 98382 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept. of Palliative Medicine
H Wing, 3rd Floor, Suite H353
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
CAMH College Site
Department of Psychiatry
Suite 841
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATELYN BRET REYNOLDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYNOLDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018