skip to content

Reynolds, David Robert

CPSO#: 29404

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jul 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Reynolds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Taras Nahirny 303-1235 Trafalgar Rd Oakville ON L6H 3P1
Date Received: 28 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019