skip to content

Reyes, Celia Ang

CPSO#: 31277

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 May 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 May 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ste 300-301
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone: 416 486 8088 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2180 Steeles Ave W
Vaughan ON  L4K2Z5
Canada
Phone: 426 292 0330
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CELIA ANG REYES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 23 Jul 1973 to 15 Jun 1974
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1980 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Feb 1981 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2007