skip to content

Rewa, Oleksa Gregory

CPSO#: 88628

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Mar 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Department of Critical Care Medicine CSB 2-124 8440 112th St N W Edmonton AB T6G 2B7
Date Received: 28 Mar 2018


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Mar 2018