skip to content

Renwick, Robert Benson

CPSO#: 93727

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care London
Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Care Building, F3-225
550 Wellington Rd
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: 519-455-5110 Ext. 47401
Fax: 519-455-2262 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Renwick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Renwick ( CPSO# 93727 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT BENSON RENWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENWICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 May 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
EL - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011