skip to content

Rennie, James Stuart

CPSO#: 23564

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Oct 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 North Service Road West
Oakville ON  L6M 2S2
Phone: (905) 338-3730
Fax: (905) 338-3731 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. S. Rennie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rennie ( CPSO# 23564 )

Business Address:
300 North Service Road West
Oakville ON  L6M 2S2
Phone Number: (905) 338-3730

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES STUART RENNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENNIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 24 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987