skip to content

Renner, Eberhard Ludwig

CPSO#: 87645

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Basel, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eberhard Renner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: University Health Network Liver Transplant Program 585 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Date Received: 17 Nov 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective:02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Nov 2016