skip to content

Renaud, Matthew John

CPSO#: 84848

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital - KW Site
Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4242 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
Emergency Department
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Matthew John Renaud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Renaud ( CPSO# 84848 )

Business Address:
St Mary's General Hospital
Emergency Department
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
KW Site
Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOHN RENAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENAUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008