skip to content

Ren, Haifeng

CPSO#: 85038

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Shanghai Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
110 Copper Creek Dr.
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone: 905-472-8911
Fax: 905-472-6081 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

4125 Lawrence Ave East, Unit 208
Pinnacle Health Sciences Scarboroug
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Canada
Phone: 416-546-0848
Fax: 416-546-1858
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Urgent Care Centre
51 Mountainash Rd, Unit 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
Phone: 905-799-2722
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital -
University Health Network
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-2581
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

9651 Yonge Street
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Canada
Phone: 905-780-8823
Fax: 905-780-8821
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

MCI-Woodbridge
700-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3
Canada
Phone: 905-856-2100
Fax: 905-856-2101
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Ren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ren ( CPSO# 85038 )

Business Address:
Brampton Urgent Care Centre
51 Mountainash Road
Suite 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Phone Number: (905) 799-2722

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Urgent Care
110 Copper Creek Drive
Suite 100
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 472-8911

Business Address:
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: (905) 780-8823

Business Address:
Pinnacle Health Sciences
Scarborough Centre
4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 208
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone Number: (416) 546-0848

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
MCI-Woodbridge
700-200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3
Phone Number: (905) 856-2100

Business Address:
MCI Bloor Street
4A-345 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Phone Number: (416) 515-0590

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 27 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HAIFENG REN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013