Remus, John Leonard (CPSO#: 21061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Oct 2004

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ridgeway Clinic
1001 Ridgeway Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5H8
Phone: (807) 623-7252
Fax: (807) 622-6427
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 26 Feb 2019

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary: On February 11, 2019, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee referred the matter of Dr. Remus’ capacity to the Fitness to Practise Committee.

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 26 Feb 2019 Active View Details [+]

            (Matter 1 of 3)

            As  from  February  26, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate  of  registration held by Dr. John Leonard Remus
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Remus to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. JOHN LEONARD REMUS
                                             ("Dr. Remus")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


                                    
            A     .PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions  Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act,  1991,  S.O.  1991,  c.  18,  as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS"  means  the  Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means  the  College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Remus, certificate of registration  number  21061,  am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I,  Dr.  Remus,  acknowledge  that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7216068 (the  "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent.

            (4)   I, Dr. Remus, acknowledge that, after  the  College  receives an original
                  copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, no further action will be taken
                  on the Investigation.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Remus, undertake to abide by the provisions of  this  Undertaking,
                  effective immediately. 

            (6)   Limitation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I,   Dr.  Remus,  undertake  that  I  will  limit  my   issuing  of
                        prescriptions  or  renewing  of  existing  prescriptions to a total
                        duration of four weeks, for any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic  Drugs (from the Narcotic Control  Regulations  made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                                     19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations  (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled  Drugs  and  Substances  Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled   Drugs   (from  Part  G  of  the  Food  and  Drug
                              Regulations under the  Food  and  Drugs  Act,  S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines  and  Other  Targeted  Substances  (from  the
                              Benzodiazepines  and  Other  Targeted  Substances Regulations
                              made  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances  Act.,  S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary  of  the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals  and  Specialties]  is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory  lists are
                              attached hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                        (v)   All  other  Monitored  Drugs  (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,  S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "C");                       
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
            (7)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Remus, undertake that I shall post  a  sign  in  all waiting
                        rooms  and  in  each  examination  and  consulting room, in all  my
                        Practice Locations, in a clearly visible  and  secure  location, in
                        the form set out at Schedule "D."  For further clarity,  this  sign
                        shall state as follows: 
                  
                        IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                        Dr.  Remus  has  agreed  to  limit  his issuing of prescriptions or
                        renewing of existing prescriptions to  a  total  duration  of  four
                        weeks, for any of the following substances: 
                  
                        Narcotic Drugs
                        Narcotic Preparations
                        Controlled Drugs
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        All other Monitored Drugs
                        Further  information  may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Remus, undertake  to  post  a  certified  translation in any
                        language  in  which  I provide services, of the sign  described  in
                        section (7)(a) above,  in all waiting rooms and in each examination
                        and consulting room, in  all  my  Practice  Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "D." 
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Remus,  undertake  to  provide  the certified  translation
                        described in section (7)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr. Remus, undertake that if I elect, after  the  execution  of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr.  Remus,  undertake  to  provide to the College the certified
                        translation  described in section  (7)(c)  prior  to  beginning  to
                        provide services in any language described in section (7)(d).
                  
            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Remus,  undertake  that  I  have  voluntarily  restricted my
                        practice to the following areas:
                  
                        (i)   Occupational Medicine and Priority Medicals;
                        (ii)  Transport   Canada:   Civil   Aviation   and  Marine  Medical
                              Examinations;
                        (iii) Sports Medicine:  Examination and treatments
                        (iv)  Independent Medical Examinations;
                        (v)   Disability Examinations;
                        (vi)  Veterans Affairs Canada and WSIB  Assessments and Independent
                              Medical Assessments; and
                        (vii) Ambulatory Orthopaedic Clinic.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Remus, do not practice primary care. 
                  
            (9)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I,  Dr. Remus, undertake that I shall post a sign  in  all  waiting
                        rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure
                        location,  in  the  form  set  out  at  Appendix  "E."  For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
                  
                        Dr. Remus has agreed to limit his practice to the following areas: 
                  
                        (i)   Occupational Medicine and Priority Medicals;
                        (ii)  Transport   Canada:   Civil   Aviation   and  Marine  Medical
                              Examinations;
                        (iii) Sports Medicine:  Examination and treatments;
                        (iv)  Independent Medical Examinations;
                        (v)   Disability Examinations;
                        (vi)  Veterans Affairs Canada and WSIB  Assessments and Independent
                              Medical Assessments; and
                        (vii) Ambulatory Orthopaedic Clinic.
                  
                        Dr. Remus does not provide primary care. 
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College  of  Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Remus,  undertake to post a certified translation  in  any
                        language in which  I  provide  services,  of  the sign described in
                        section  (9)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice  Locations,
                        in a clearly  visible  and  secure location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "E." 
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Remus,  undertake  to provide  the  certified  translation
                        described in section (9)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Remus, undertake that  if  I  elect,  after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I,  Dr.  Remus, undertake to provide to the College  the  certified
                        translation  described  in  section  (9)(b)  prior  to beginning to
                        provide services in any language described in section (9)(d).
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Remus, undertake to inform the College of each and every  location
                  that  I  practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,  any
                  hospitals,  clinics,  offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with
                  which I am affiliated,  in  any  jurisdiction  (collectively my "Practice
                  Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five  (5)  days  of  executing
                  this  Undertaking.   Going  forward,  I  further  undertake to inform the
                  College of any and all new Practice Locations within  five  (5)  days  of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Remus,  undertake  to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or  have  privileges,  including, but not
                        limited  to,  any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any  Independent
                        Health Facilities  with  which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively  my "Practice  Location"  or  "Practice  Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake  to  inform  the  College  of  any  and all new
                        Practice  Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice  at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Remus,  undertake  that  I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of  my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative  for  the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Remus, give my irrevocable consent  to  the  College to make
                        appropriate  enquiries  of  OHIP,  NMS  and/or  any person  who  or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in  order  for  the
                        College  to  monitor  my  compliance  with  the  provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr. Remus, acknowledge that I have executed the  OHIP  and  NMS
                        consent  forms,  attached  hereto as Appendix "F" and Appendix "G",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Remus, acknowledge that all  appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this 
                  Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
                  
            (13)  I,  Dr.  Remus,  acknowledge  and  undertake   that  I  shall  be  solely
                  responsible  for  payment  of  all fees, costs, charges,  expenses,  etc.
                  arising  from  the implementation  of  any  of  the  provisions  of  this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Remus, acknowledge  that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this  Undertaking,  or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Remus, acknowledge that the College will  provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar  responsibilities,  at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (16)  I,  Dr.  Remus,  acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute  an  act  of  professional  misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence,  and  may result in a referral of specified allegations  to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (17)  I,  Dr.  Remus, acknowledge  that  this  Undertaking  constitutes  terms,
                  conditions,  and  limitations  on  my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Remus, acknowledge that,  during  the  time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking  shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Remus,  acknowledge that, in addition to this  Undertaking
                        being  posted  in  accordance   with  section  (18)(a)  above,  the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A  College  investigation  was conducted  into  whether  Dr.  Remus
                        engaged in professional misconduct  and/or  was  incompetent.  As a
                        result  of  the  investigation,  has agreed to limit his issuing of
                        prescriptions  or renewing of existing  prescriptions  to  a  total
                        duration of four weeks, for any of the following substances: 
                  
                        Narcotic Drugs
                        Narcotic Preparations
                        Controlled Drugs
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                        In addition, Dr.  Remus has voluntarily restricted his practice  to
                        the following areas: 
                  
                        (i)   Occupational Medicine and Priority Medicals;
                        (ii)  Transport  Canada:   Civil   Aviation   and   Marine  Medical
                              Examinations;
                        (iii) Sports Medicine:  Examination and treatments;
                        (iv)  Independent Medical Examinations;
                        (v)   Disability Examinations;
                        (vi)  Veterans Affairs Canada and WSIB  Assessments and Independent
                              Medical Assessments; and
                        (vii) Ambulatory Orthopaedic Clinic.
                  
                        Dr. Remus does not provide primary care. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Remus, give my irrevocable consent to the College to  provide  all
                  Chiefs  of  Staff  with  any  information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.


            (Matter 2 of 3)

            As from September 25, 2018, the following  is  imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Leonard Remus in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Remus to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.  Remus  must practise under the guidance  of  a  Clinical  Supervisor
                  acceptable to the College.
                  
                  
            (Matter 3 of 3)

            As from October 29,  2004,  Dr. John Leonard Remus undertakes to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that he will,

            1.    Perform "minor" orthopaedic  surgery limited to outpatient procedures and
                  which is considered, for the purposes  of  Dr.  Remus's  Undertaking,  to
                  consist  of  arthroscopy  limited to the knee, and other outpatient minor
                  surgical procedures limited to the elbow, wrist, hands, ankle or feet;

            2.    Continue to not participate  in  the  on-call  orthopaedic  roster at his
                  hospital;

            3.    Provide  at  least  three  months written notice to the Quality Assurance
                  Committee of the College if  he  wishes  to  resume  performing any other
                  orthopaedic surgical procedures or if he wishes to start participating in
                  the on-call orthopaedic roster; and

            4.    Comply with all assessment, review and enhancement activities directed by
                  the  Quality  Assurance  Committee  before  resuming performance  of  any
                  orthopaedic surgical procedures, either categorized  as  "major" (ie. not
                  delineated  in  paragraph  1  above)  or  taking  place  in the emergency
                  department.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: February 26, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Leonard Remus to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 26, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Remus engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent. As a result of the investigation, has agreed to limit his issuing of prescriptions or renewing of existing prescriptions to a total duration of four weeks, for any of the following substances:

Narcotic Drugs
Narcotic Preparations
Controlled Drugs
Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
All other Monitored Drugs

In addition, Dr. Remus has voluntarily restricted his practice to the following areas:

(i)Occupational Medicine and Priority Medicals;
(ii)Transport Canada: Civil Aviation and Marine Medical Examinations;
(iii)Sports Medicine: Examination and treatments;
(iv)Independent Medical Examinations;
(v)Disability Examinations;
(vi)Veterans Affairs Canada and WSIB Assessments and Independent Medical Assessments; and
(vii)Ambulatory Orthopaedic Clinic.

Dr. Remus does not provide primary care.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)