skip to content

Remington, Tamara Leah

CPSO#: 97468

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 30 Apr 2012 to 20 May 2012
EL - Infectious Diseases

University Of Toronto, 30 Apr 2012 to 20 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Infectious Diseases

University Of Toronto, 25 Aug 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
EL - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2014