skip to content

Rekman, Janelle Francine

CPSO#: 96068

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Surgical Services Office
499 Raglan St N
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANELLE FRANCINE REKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REKMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019