skip to content

Reisman, William Jed

CPSO#: 98342

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858805
Fax: 5196676715 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:22 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JED REISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REISMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2019