skip to content

Reinglas, Jason Morris

CPSO#: 98870

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montreal General Hospital
1650 Ave. Cedar
Montreal QC  H3G 1A4
Phone: 5149341934

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASON MORRIS REINGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REINGLAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017