skip to content

Reid, Robert Leslie

CPSO#: 28139

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 May 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Concord Dr
Kingston ON  K7L4V1
Phone: (613) 453-9715 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert Leslie Reid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Reid ( CPSO# 28139 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
OBS/GYN Victory 4
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 542-9473

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT LESLIE REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1981