skip to content

Reid, Heather Lynn

CPSO#: 100991

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF H Svc - CFS St John's
115 The Boulevard
St. John's NL
St. John's NL  A1C6B5
Phone: (705)733-3640

Additional Practice Location(s)

24 Moore St
Lions Head ON  N0H 1W0
Canada
Phone: 519-793-3445
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Heather Reid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Reid ( CPSO# 100991)

Business Address:
24 Moore Street
Lions Head ON  N0H 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 793-3445


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER LYNN REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2015