skip to content

Reichman, Trevor William

CPSO#: 90474

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Mar 2021
EXPIRY DATE
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
11-PMB-172
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5404
Fax: (416) 340-4039 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:11 Jan 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 06 Jan 2022
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Mar 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2021 Active
 1.    Dr. Trevor William Reichman may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  General  Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Reichman holds an academic  appointment  at  the  rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when  Dr.  Reichman
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.