skip to content

Reichert, Sonja Maria

CPSO#: 90018

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mailing Address:
PO Box 5777, Stn. B
London, ON N6A 6V2
Clinic Address: 346 Platt's Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 67268
Fax: (519) 645-6961 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sonja M. Reichert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Reichert ( CPSO# 90018 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Primary Care Diabetes Support Program
346 Platts Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 646-9660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Sep 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SONJA MARIA REICHERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REICHERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2009 to 07 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011