skip to content

Rehsia, Sachdeep Singh

CPSO#: 86558

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Department Of Medicine
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sachdeep Rehsia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rehsia ( CPSO# 86558 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SACHDEEP SINGH REHSIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REHSIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2011