skip to content

Rehsia, Sabeer Singh

CPSO#: 99037

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2015