skip to content

Refling, Lars

CPSO#: 24702

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 30 Mar 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lars Refling Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2017
Corporation Name: Refling Braithwaite-Walton Zides Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Advanced MD Urgent Care Suite 125 289 South Pelham Road Welland, ON L3C 3C7
Date Received: 30 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Mar 2017