skip to content

Reeve, Kate Christina

CPSO#: 90633

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
IWHC
489 College St #200
Toronto ON  M6G 1A5
Phone: (416) 323-9986
Fax: (416) 323-0447 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Crossways - Toronto Public Health
2340 Dundas St W
Toronto ON  M6P 4A9
Canada
Phone: 416-392-0999
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATE CHRISTINA REEVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012