skip to content

Redekop, Kylie Justine

CPSO#: 97680

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NHS Greater Niagara General Site
5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Louise Marshall Hospital
630 Dublin St
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Canada
Phone: (519) 323-2210
Fax: (519) 323-3741
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

230 Bertie St
NHS Douglas Memorial Hospital Site
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

260 Sugarloaf St
NHS Port Colborne Site
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

65 Third St
NHS Welland Hospital Site
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

400 Broad St W
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Canada
Phone: (905) 774-7431
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kylie J. Redekop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Redekop ( CPSO# 97680 )

Business Address:
400 Broad St W
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone Number: 905-774-7431

Business Address:
5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2

Business Address:
230 Bertie St
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Phone Number: 9053784647

Business Address:
260 Sugarloaf St
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Phone Number: 9053784647

Business Address:
178 Main St N
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L1
Phone Number: 519-509-2100

Business Address:
65 Third St
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: 905-378-4647

Business Address:
630 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 323-2210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KYLIE JUSTINE REDEKOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDEKOP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014