skip to content

Reddy, Garisa Jagan Mohan

CPSO#: 90244

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Feb 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Sri Venkatesvara University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nolin Center
Lower Level
435 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone: (705) 675-2100
Fax: (705) 675-2101 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jagan Reddy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Reddy ( CPSO# 90244 )

Business Address:
435 Notre Dame Avenue
Lower Level
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone Number: (705) 675-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:11 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GARISA JAGAN MOHAN REDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2009

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)