Redditt, Vanessa Jane (CPSO#: 98795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Crossroads Clinic
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St, Floor 3
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6031
Fax: 416-323-6015
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E.
2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANESSA JANE REDDITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDITT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015