skip to content

Reddington, Mark

CPSO#: 90533

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone: (519) 524-8689 Ext. 5388
Fax: 519 524 8513 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Reddington & Renaud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Renaud ( CPSO# 88371 )
Dr. M. Reddington ( CPSO# 90533 )

Business Address:
Alexandria Marine & General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Business Address:
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Business Address:
274 Huron Road
Goderich ON  N7A 3A2
Phone Number: (519) 524-8316

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK REDDINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2014