Recoskie, Bryan (CPSO#: 93714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stayner Medical Centre
Box 220
7477 Highway 26
Stayner ON  L0M 1S0
Phone: (705) 428-3246
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Collingwood G&M Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
Phone: (705) 445-2550
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Grey Bruce Health Services- Meaford
229 Nelson Street West
Meaford ON  N4L 1A3
Canada
Phone: (519) 538-1311
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Recoskie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Recoskie ( CPSO# 93714 )

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
229 Nelson Street West
Meaford ON  N4L 1A3
Phone Number: (519) 538-1311

Business Address:
Stayner Medical Centre
7477 Highway 26
Stayner ON  L0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 428-3246

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYAN RECOSKIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RECOSKIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012