skip to content

Reardon, Rachel Ann Miller

CPSO#: 92913

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Physical Med & Rehab
Parkwood Hospital
4th Floor Hobbins Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: 519-685-4000 Ext. 45027
Fax: 519-685-4009 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RACHEL ANN MILLER REARDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REARDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015