skip to content

Reardon, Mary Lynne

CPSO#: 31008

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Reardon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2019