skip to content

Ready, William Kirkby

CPSO#: 96945

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W. Kirk Ready Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre, 50 College Drive, North Bay, ON P1B 0A4
Date Received: 09 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016