skip to content

Razzaq, Mahreen Abdul

CPSO#: 92557

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Team Maple Walk-in Clinic
2200 Rutherford Road
Unit 101
Vaughan ON  L4K 5V2
Phone: (905) 731-5535 Ext. 1
Fax: (905) 417-7888 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mahreen Razzaq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Razzaq ( CPSO# 92557 )

Business Address:
Unit 101
2200 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5V2
Phone Number: (905) 731-5535


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Feb 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Sep 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011 Active
 Dr.  Mahreen  Abdul  Razzaq may practise medicine independently in family
                  medicine, only.