skip to content

Razavi, Amir Hossein

CPSO#: 97021

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone: (416) 2421000 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Razavi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Razavi ( CPSO# 97021 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:11 Nov 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014 Active
 Dr. Amir Hossein Razavi may practise medicine independently in internal
            medicine, only.