skip to content

Razack, Vanessa Amina

CPSO#: 97076

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatric Emergency
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 201753
Fax: (416) 813-5285 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

suite 301
491 eglington ave w
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: 4168487665
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vanessa A. Razack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:01 Dec 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active
 Dr.  Vanessa  Amina  Razack  may  practise medicine independently in paediatric
            emergency medicine, only.