Razack, Tamazadeene (CPSO#: 99619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Englehart Family Health Team
63 5th Street
Englehart ON  P0J 1H0
Phone: (705) 544-2321
Fax: (705) 544-5224
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tamazadeene Razack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Razack ( CPSO# 99619 )

Business Address:
63 Fifth Street
Englehart ON  P0J 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 544-2321

Medical Records Location

Address: c/o Dr. Allen Boettcher Bingham Memorial Hospital 507 8th Avenue P O Box 70 Matheson ON P0K 1N0
Date Received: 10 Nov 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMAZADEENE RAZACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZACK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2012

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)